HB0245 (CH0259)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Department of Commerce - Maryland Advisory Commission on Manufacturing Competitiveness - Renaming and Restructuring

Sponsored by:

Chair, Economic Matters Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20171/23/2017First Reading Economic Matters
1/24/20171/24/2017Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/9/20173/9/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/10/20173/10/2017Favorable with Amendments {563699/1 Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed with Amendments43
3/15/20173/12/2017Third Reading Passed (136-0)46A
Senate3/16/20173/16/2017First Reading Finance45
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20174/3/2017Favorable Report by Finance
4/3/20173/28/2017Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/4/20173/29/2017Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Astle) Adopted 58
4/6/20173/31/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/6/20173/30/2017Returned Passed64
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 259

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 9:06 A.M.