HB0247 (CH0091)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Procedure - Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository - Administration

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judiciary Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed45
3/14/20133/14/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)47
Senate3/15/20133/15/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings46
3/20/20133/20/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)61
House4/4/20133/30/2013Returned Passed63
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.