HB0254 (CH0092)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Allegany County - Criminal Procedure - Custody of Arrested Persons Before Release

Sponsored by:

Allegany County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2/25/20132/25/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
2/26/20132/26/2013Favorable Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed35
2/28/20132/28/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)37
Senate2/28/20132/28/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings35
3/13/20133/13/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)61
House4/4/20133/30/2013Returned Passed63
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.