HB0264 (CH0611)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Juvenile Law - Juvenile Records - Disclosure

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judiciary Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
1/25/20131/25/2013Hearing cancelled
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed40
3/7/20133/7/2013Third Reading Passed (129-9)42
Senate3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings41
3/13/20133/13/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (45-1)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:00 P.M.