HB0282

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judiciary Committee

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
1/25/20131/25/2013Hearing cancelled
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments {992217/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/7/20133/7/2013Third Reading Passed (111-27)42
Senate3/8/20133/8/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings41
4/1/20134/1/2013Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.