HB0286 (CH0809)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Circuit Court Clerks - Salary Increase

Sponsored by:

Delegate Dumais

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 809


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/22/20181/22/2018First Reading Judiciary
1/19/20181/19/2018Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
1/24/20181/24/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
3/19/20183/19/2018Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/19/20183/14/2018Favorable Report Adopted48
Second Reading Passed48
3/19/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (96-41)49
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings48B
3/26/20183/26/2018Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/26/20183/22/2018Favorable Report Adopted53
Second Reading Passed53
3/27/20183/23/2018Third Reading Passed (46-1)54
House3/27/20183/20/2018Returned Passed54
Post Passage5/26/20185/26/2018Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 809

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 29, 2018 3:53 P.M.