HB0292 (CH0431)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Safety - Statewide DNA Data Base System - DNA Sample Collection on Arrest - Reporting Requirement and Repeal of Sunset

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judiciary Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/23/20131/23/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable with Amendments {562319/1 Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/14/20133/14/2013Third Reading Passed (135-1)47
Senate3/15/20133/15/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings46
3/20/20133/20/2013Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (39-7)61
House4/4/20133/30/2013Returned Passed63
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.