HB0300 (CH0451)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings

Sponsored by:

Delegate Fennell

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/25/20171/25/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/1/20172/1/2017Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
3/9/20173/9/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/10/20173/10/2017Favorable with Amendments {385263/1 Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed with Amendments43
3/15/20173/12/2017Third Reading Passed (126-11)46A
Senate3/16/20173/16/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation45
3/21/20173/21/2017Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20174/3/2017Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/3/20173/28/2017Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/4/20173/29/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)58
House4/4/20173/28/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 12:59 P.M.