HB0301 (CH0362)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act of 2018)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Atterbeary

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/22/20181/22/2018First Reading Judiciary
1/19/20181/19/2018Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {172019/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings48B
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.