HB0302

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Medical Marijuana Act

Sponsored by:

Delegate Glenn

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/24/20131/24/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
2/20/20132/20/2013Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. ( Health and Government Operations)
2/27/20132/27/2013Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
3/5/20133/5/2013Hearing cancelled (Judiciary)
Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
3/25/20133/25/2013Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.