HB0308 (CH0021)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit

Sponsored by:

Delegate Tarlau

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/22/20181/22/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/24/20181/24/2018Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20183/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {915861/1 Report Adopted40
Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted 40
3/7/20183/7/2018Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (89-48)42
Senate3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation43
3/14/20183/14/2018Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20183/23/2018Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/23/20183/21/2018Favorable Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed52
3/26/20183/22/2018Third Reading Passed (43-3)53
House3/27/20183/20/2018Returned Passed54
Post Passage4/5/20184/5/2018Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 6, 2018 4:07 P.M.