HB0309

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Courts - Discovery - Examination in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment

Sponsored by:

Delegate Norman

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/24/20131/24/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/25/20132/25/2013Favorable Report by Judiciary
2/26/20132/26/2013Favorable Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed35
2/28/20132/28/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)37
Senate2/28/20132/28/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings35
3/13/20133/13/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.