HB0315 (CH0560)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Department of Education - Breakfast and Lunch Programs - Funding (Maryland Cares for Kids Act)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hixson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/22/20181/22/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/25/20181/25/2018Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {905760/1 Report Adopted47A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47A
3/19/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (118-20)49
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48B
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
3/30/20183/30/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/30/20183/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {829936/1 Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed with Amendments58
4/2/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)59
House4/5/20183/27/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments61
Third Reading Passed (117-20)61
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:36 P.M.