HB0365 (CH0616)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Harford County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone

Sponsored by:

Delegate Glass

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/25/20131/25/2013First Reading Environmental Matters
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable with Amendments {140818/1 Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/14/20133/14/2013Third Reading Passed (134-2)47
Senate3/15/20133/15/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments {464235/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)64
House4/8/20134/5/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments69
Third Reading Passed (135-3)69
Passed Enrolled69
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.