HB0372 (CH0352)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act

Sponsored by:

Delegate Korman

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/24/20181/24/2018First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
3/5/20183/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {594361/1 Report Adopted40
Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate Kittleman) Adopted 40
3/7/20183/7/2018Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (97-41)42
Senate3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation43
3/14/20183/14/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/15/20183/15/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/29/20183/26/2018Favorable with Amendments {979130/1 Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed with Amendments57
3/30/20183/27/2018Floor Amendment {173721/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted58
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)58
House4/5/20183/27/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments61
Third Reading Passed (96-41)61
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/25/20184/25/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 25, 2018 4:52 P.M.