HB0396 (CH0369)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Misuse of Interactive Computer Service (Grace's Law)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Cardin

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/25/20131/25/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing cancelled
2/11/20132/11/2013Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22/20133/22/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/22/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments {382418/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/23/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (134-0)53
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings52
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)61
House4/4/20133/29/2013Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.