HB0397

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Assessments - Best Practices in the Administration of Assessments

Sponsored by:

Delegate Washington, M.

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/28/20161/28/2016First Reading Ways and Means
2/3/20162/3/2016Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2/4/20162/4/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20163/17/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20163/14/2016Favorable with Amendments {385468/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/18/20163/16/2016Third Reading Passed (138-0)48
Senate3/21/20163/18/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs47A

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:59 P.M.