HB0406 (CH0362)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Clean Cars Act of 2017

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/26/20171/26/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation
2/2/20172/2/2017Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20173/18/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/18/20173/15/2017Favorable with Amendments {340912/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/20/20173/16/2017Third Reading Passed (123-11)50
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation46A
3/21/20173/21/2017Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
4/10/20174/10/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable with Amendments {107577/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Middleton) Adopted62
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)62
House4/10/20174/4/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments69
Third Reading Passed (129-11)69
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:10 A.M.