HB0408 (CH0258)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management Equipment

Sponsored by:

Delegate Conway

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/28/20131/28/2013First Reading Ways and Means
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/20/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {965160/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/21/20133/18/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)51
Senate3/22/20133/20/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation51
3/27/20133/27/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20134/1/2013Hearing cancelled
Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Hearing cancelled
Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (46-0)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.