HB0420 (CH0113)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Vehicle Laws - Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls

Sponsored by:

Chair, Environmental Matters Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/28/20131/28/2013First Reading Environmental Matters
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21/20133/21/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/21/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments {470217/1 Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/23/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (133-0)53
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Finance52
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable with Amendments {827274/1 Report Adopted60
Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) {843124/1 Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 61
House4/5/20133/31/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (136-0)64
Passed Enrolled64
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.