HB0429 (CH0163)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Sexual Offenses - Physical Resistance

Sponsored by:

Delegate Dumais

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/26/20171/26/2017First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20173/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/7/20173/7/2017Favorable with Amendments {272117/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/9/20173/9/2017Third Reading Passed (139-0)42
Senate3/10/20173/10/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings41
3/30/20173/30/2017Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/30/20173/26/2017Favorable Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed55
4/7/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed (45-0)61
House4/7/20173/31/2017Returned Passed65
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:10 A.M.