HB0442 (CH0052)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal History Records Checks - Child Care Providers

Sponsored by:

Delegate Dumais

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/28/20131/28/2013First Reading Judiciary
1/30/20131/30/2013Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/18/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/19/20133/16/2013Favorable with Amendments {712912/1 Report Adopted49
Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/20/20133/17/2013Third Reading Passed (136-0)50
Senate3/21/20133/19/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings50
4/3/20134/3/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20133/29/2013Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20133/30/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)61
House4/4/20133/29/2013Returned Passed62
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:01 P.M.