HB0463

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses MC 16-14

Sponsored by:

Montgomery County Delegation

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/27/20141/27/2014First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20143/7/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/10/20143/7/2014Favorable with Amendments {523494/1 Report Adopted43A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments43A
3/11/20143/8/2014Third Reading Passed (136-1)44
Senate3/12/20143/9/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs43
3/28/20143/28/2014Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/20143/21/2014Favorable Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed55
3/31/20143/22/2014Third Reading Passed (46-0)56
House4/1/20143/25/2014Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/15/20145/15/2014Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2014 11:40 A.M.