HB0476

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Procedure - Alien Defendants - Nullity of Bail Bonds

Sponsored by:

Delegate Simmons

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/30/20131/30/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/4/20133/4/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/5/20133/5/2013Favorable with Amendments {142716/1 Report Adopted40
Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted 40
3/7/20133/7/2013Second Reading Passed with Amendments42
3/12/20133/12/2013Third Reading Passed (121-14)45
Senate3/13/20133/13/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings44

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.