HB0477

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before Judgment

Sponsored by:

Delegate Simmons

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/30/20131/30/2013First Reading Judiciary
2/8/20132/8/2013Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2/26/20132/25/2013Hearing cancelled
2/25/20132/25/2013Hearing 3/01 at 12:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Unfavorable Report by Judiciary

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.