HB0514

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of Information

Sponsored by:

Delegate O'Donnell

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/30/20131/30/2013First Reading Environmental Matters
2/1/20132/1/2013Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Hearing cancelled
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
3/20/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {740110/1 Report Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/21/20133/18/2013Third Reading Passed (138-0)51
Senate3/22/20133/20/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs51
3/25/20133/25/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:02 P.M.