HB0526 (CH0288)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Art Establishment License

Sponsored by:

St. Mary's County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/30/20171/30/2017First Reading Economic Matters
1/27/20171/27/2017Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20173/6/2017Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/7/20173/7/2017Favorable Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed40
3/10/20173/10/2017Third Reading Passed (137-0)43
Senate3/13/20173/13/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs42
3/15/20173/15/2017Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/10/20174/3/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)63A
House4/10/20174/4/2017Returned Passed69
Post Passage4/18/20174/18/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:10 A.M.