HB0548

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Privately Owned Transportation Projects - Construction and Authorization to Use State-Owned Rights-of-Way and Property - Requirements

Sponsored by:

Delegate Healey

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/26/20181/26/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation
1/30/20181/30/2018Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
4/5/20183/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {930510/1 Report Adopted61A
Floor Amendment {593524/1 (Delegate Valentino-Smith) Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/6/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed (95-42)62
Senate4/6/20184/1/2018First Reading Senate Rules63
4/9/20184/9/2018Rereferred to Finance
Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/9/20184/4/2018Favorable with Amendments {517172/1 Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed with Amendments66
4/9/20184/5/2018Special Order until later today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 67
Motion limit debate (Senator Peters) Adopted (34-11)67
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (29-11)67
House4/9/20184/5/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments70
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (100-37)70
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20185/25/2018Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 29, 2018 3:54 P.M.