HB0570 (CH0576)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax - Standard Deduction - Alteration and Cost-of-Living Adjustments

Sponsored by:

Delegate Gilchrist

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 576


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/29/20181/29/2018First Reading Ways and Means
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {495365/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (135-0)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation48B
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {489330/1 Report Adopted62A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62A
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)63
House4/7/20183/30/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (137-0)64
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 576

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:16 P.M.