HB0622 (CH0386)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Schools – Students With Sickle Cell Disease – Guidelines

Sponsored by:

Delegate Patterson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/29/20181/29/2018First Reading Ways and Means
1/30/20181/30/2018Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2/22/20182/22/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2/23/20182/23/2018Favorable with Amendments {305765/1 Report Adopted33
Second Reading Passed with Amendments33
2/27/20182/27/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)35
Senate2/28/20182/28/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs36
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/20183/26/2018Favorable with Amendments {994935/1 Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed with Amendments57
3/30/20183/27/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)58
House4/5/20183/27/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments61
Third Reading Passed (138-0)61
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.