HB0642 (CH0110)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses

Sponsored by:

Anne Arundel County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/4/20162/4/2016First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/8/20163/8/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/9/20163/9/2016Favorable with Amendments {443893/1 Report Adopted41
Second Reading Passed with Amendments41
3/14/20163/11/2016Third Reading Passed (135-0)43A
Senate3/15/20163/15/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs44
4/5/20164/5/2016Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20163/30/2016Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/6/20163/31/2016Third Reading Passed (46-0)60
House4/7/20163/31/2016Returned Passed63
Post Passage4/12/20164/12/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:01 P.M.