HB0649 (CH0130)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Beer Containers MC 4-13

Sponsored by:

Montgomery County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20132/1/2013First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20133/7/2013Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/8/20133/8/2013Favorable Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed43
3/12/20133/12/2013Third Reading Passed (134-0)45
Senate3/13/20133/13/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs44
3/15/20133/15/2013Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/20133/27/2013Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:06 P.M.