HB0657 (CH0273)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Prekindergarten and Kindergarten Assessments - Administration

Sponsored by:

Delegate Shoemaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/4/20162/4/2016First Reading Ways and Means
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20163/17/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20163/14/2016Favorable with Amendments {725168/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/18/20163/16/2016Third Reading Passed (140-0)48
Senate3/21/20163/18/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs47A
4/4/20164/4/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20163/30/2016Favorable with Amendments {584137/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/6/20163/31/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)60
House4/8/20164/2/2016House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments65
House Requests Senate Recede65
Conference Committee Appointed65
Delegates Kaiser, Hornberger, and A. Washington65
Senate4/11/20164/3/2016Senate Refuses to Recede63A
Conference Committee Appointed63A
Senators Pinsky, Waugh, and Conway63A
House4/11/20164/8/2016Conference Committee Report Adopted71
Third Reading Passed (141-0)71
Senate4/11/20164/7/2016Conference Committee Report Adopted67
Third Reading Passed (46-0)67
House4/11/20164/9/2016Passed Enrolled67
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:01 P.M.