HB0680 (CH0111)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Local Anesthesia

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kipke

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/4/20162/4/2016First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
3/8/20163/8/2016Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
3/9/20163/9/2016Favorable Report Adopted41
Second Reading Passed41
3/11/20163/11/2016Third Reading Passed (136-0)43
Senate3/14/20163/14/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs43
4/5/20164/5/2016Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20163/31/2016Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/7/20164/1/2016Third Reading Passed (45-0)61A
House4/7/20164/1/2016Returned Passed64
Post Passage4/12/20164/12/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:01 P.M.