HB0684 (CH0006)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - State Grants for Education Aid

Sponsored by:

Delegate Krebs

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20172/1/2017First Reading Appropriations
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/14/20173/11/2017Favorable with Amendments {784664/1 Report Adopted45
Floor Amendment {683321/1 (Delegate M. Washington) Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/15/20173/12/2017Third Reading Passed (124-13)46A
Senate3/16/20173/16/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation45
3/21/20173/21/2017Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/27/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/27/20173/23/2017Favorable with Amendments {849838/1 Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/28/20173/24/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)53
House3/28/20173/24/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments58
Third Reading Passed (129-8)58
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/3/20174/3/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:02 P.M.