HB0713 (CH0636)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human Trafficking

Sponsored by:

Delegate Dumais

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/4/20132/4/2013First Reading Judiciary
2/1/20132/1/2013Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20133/23/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/23/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments {132110/1 Report Adopted53A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments53A
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (136-0)54
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings52
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed (46-1)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:03 P.M.