HB0716 (CH0473)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Anne Arundel County - Board of Education

Sponsored by:

Anne Arundel County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/2/20172/2/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/7/20172/7/2017Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/16/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments {425962/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/17/20173/14/2017Third Reading Passed (138-0)48
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
4/5/20174/5/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20173/31/2017Favorable Report Adopted60
Floor Amendment {353628/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/10/20174/2/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-1)62
House4/10/20174/3/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments68
Third Reading Passed (139-0)68
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.