HB0720 (CH0167)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension Formula

Sponsored by:

Allegany County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Appropriations
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable Report by Appropriations
3/17/20183/13/2018Favorable Report Adopted47A
Second Reading Passed47A
3/19/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (137-1)49
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings48B
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {858071/1 Report Adopted62A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62A
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)63
House4/7/20183/31/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments65
Third Reading Passed (138-0)65
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:55 P.M.