HB0728

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Commission to Investigate the Treatment of Lender-Owned Properties

Sponsored by:

Delegate Braveboy

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/31/20141/31/2014First Reading Economic Matters
2/4/20142/4/2014Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2/7/20142/7/2014Hearing cancelled
Reassigned to Environmental Matters and Economic Matters23
2/10/20142/10/2014Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
3/13/20143/13/2014Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:51 P.M.