HB0736 (CH0217)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacies and Pharmacists - Information on and Sales of Prescription Drugs

Sponsored by:

Delegate Bromwell

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/14/20182/14/2018Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {556082/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (134-0)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance48B
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/28/20183/28/2018Favorable Report by Finance
3/28/20183/24/2018Favorable Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed55
3/29/20183/26/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)57
House3/30/20183/23/2018Returned Passed57
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.