HB0742 (CH0386)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Procedure - Citation Authority

Sponsored by:

Delegate Waldstreicher

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/6/20132/6/2013First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/11/20133/11/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/12/20133/12/2013Favorable with Amendments {412010/1 Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/14/20133/14/2013Third Reading Passed (136-2)47
Senate3/15/20133/15/2013First Reading Judicial Proceedings46
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2/20133/28/2013Favorable Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed59
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/2/20135/2/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 18, 2013 4:06 P.M.