HB0746 (CH0806)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public School Labor Relations Board - Administration and Enforcement - Revisions

Sponsored by:

Delegate Washington, M.

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 806


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/2/20172/2/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/14/20172/14/2017Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/14/20173/11/2017Favorable Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed45
3/15/20173/12/2017Third Reading Passed (133-0)46A
Senate3/16/20173/16/2017First Reading Finance45
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20174/3/2017Favorable Report by Finance
4/3/20173/28/2017Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
4/4/20173/29/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)58
House4/4/20173/28/2017Returned Passed62
Post Passage5/27/20175/27/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 806

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:02 P.M.