HB0767

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices

Sponsored by:

Delegate Sydnor

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/3/20172/3/2017First Reading Judiciary
2/7/20172/7/2017Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/14/20173/11/2017Favorable with Amendments {882519/1 Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/15/20173/12/2017Third Reading Passed (133-3)46A
Senate3/16/20173/16/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings45
3/23/20173/23/2017Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:02 P.M.