HB0771 (CH0277)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Schools - Administration of Diabetes Care Services - Guidelines

Sponsored by:

Delegate Barnes, D.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate4/11/20164/8/2016Committee Amendment {564832/1 Withdrawn68
House2/8/20162/8/2016First Reading Ways and Means
2/10/20162/10/2016Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2/12/20162/12/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2/17/20162/17/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20164/1/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/1/20163/27/2016Favorable with Amendments {325569/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/4/20163/28/2016Third Reading Passed (135-0)60
Senate4/4/20163/29/2016First Reading Senate Rules58
4/8/20164/8/2016Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/11/20164/11/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/11/20164/7/2016Favorable with Amendments {564832/1 Report Adopted67
Favorable with Amendments {564832/1 Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed with Amendments67
4/11/20164/8/2016Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Pinsky) Adopted68
Second Reading Passed68
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted (46-0)68
Third Reading Passed (46-0)68
House4/11/20164/9/2016Returned Passed72
Post Passage4/26/20164/26/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:02 P.M.