HB0789

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013

Sponsored by:

Delegate Ivey

Status:

In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/6/20132/6/2013First Reading Ways and Means
2/11/20132/11/2013Reassigned to Judiciary24
2/22/20132/22/2013Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20133/23/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/23/20133/20/2013Favorable with Amendments {152712/153A
Special Order until 3/25 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 53A
4/4/20133/30/2013Favorable with Amendments {152712/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/5/20133/31/2013Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted64
Third Reading Passed (82-56)64
Senate4/5/20134/1/2013First Reading Senate Rules63
4/8/20134/8/2013Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:03 P.M.