HB0808

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education – Collective Bargaining for Noncertificated Employees – Supervisory Employees and Management Personnel

Sponsored by:

Delegate Tarlau

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Ways and Means
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/13/20183/10/2018Favorable Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed44
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (93-44)46
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance48
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/2/20183/28/2018Favorable with Amendments {427671/1 Report Adopted59
Second Reading Passed with Amendments59
4/3/20183/29/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-14)60
House4/5/20183/27/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments61A
Third Reading Passed (91-41)61A
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20185/25/2018Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 29, 2018 3:54 P.M.