HB0811 (CH0022)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative's Access to New Employee Processing

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Ways and Means
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/13/20183/10/2018Favorable with Amendments {605868/1 Report Adopted44
Special Order until next session (Delegate Cassilly) Adopted 44
3/14/20183/11/2018Floor Amendment {763129/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (49-84)45
Floor Amendment {123324/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (50-84)45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (84-49)46A
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance48A
3/22/20183/22/2018Favorable Report by Finance
3/22/20183/20/2018Favorable Report Adopted51
Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 51
3/23/20183/21/2018Floor Amendment {883528/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (15-30)52
Floor Amendment {733328/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (14-33)52
Second Reading Passed52
3/26/20183/22/2018Third Reading Passed (33-14)53
House3/27/20183/20/2018Returned Passed54
Post Passage4/5/20184/5/2018Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 6, 2018 4:08 P.M.