HB0814 (CH0207)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Workers' Compensation - Students in Unpaid Work-Based Learning Experiences

Sponsored by:

Delegate Patterson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/1/20182/1/2018First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/8/20183/8/2018Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/13/20183/10/2018Favorable Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed44
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (136-0)46
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance48
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable Report by Finance
3/29/20183/26/2018Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
3/30/20183/27/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)58
House4/2/20183/24/2018Returned Passed58
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.