HB0817

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Property Tax Credit - Retail Service Stations - Alternate Power Sources

Sponsored by:

Delegate Murphy

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/6/20132/6/2013First Reading Ways and Means
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/19/20133/19/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/20/20133/17/2013Favorable with Amendments {735268/1 Report Adopted50
Floor Committee Amendment {395160/1 Adopted50
Second Reading Passed with Amendments50
3/25/20133/21/2013Third Reading Passed (134-0)54
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Budget and Taxation52
3/27/20133/27/2013Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:03 P.M.