HB0823

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Public School Teachers - Preparation

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/2/20182/2/2018First Reading Ways and Means
2/6/20182/6/2018Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20183/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/6/20183/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {745163/1 Report Adopted40
Second Reading Passed with Amendments40
3/8/20183/8/2018Third Reading Passed (138-0)42
Senate3/9/20183/9/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs43
3/15/20183/15/2018Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 15, 2018 10:58 A.M.